Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB622 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eiland (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 622
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the report by the General Land Office to the legislature
 on the effectiveness of the coastal management program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.204(f), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The land office, in coordination with other agencies and
 subdivisions, shall prepare a biennial [an annual] report on the
 effectiveness of the coastal management program. On or before
 January 15 of each odd-numbered year, the land office shall send the
 report to the legislature [each of the previous two annual
 reports].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *