Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB633 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias, Moody, Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Davis) H.B. No. 633
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 May 3, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a voluntary contribution to the fund for veterans'
 assistance when applying for a driver's license or personal
 identification certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 434.017(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The fund for veterans' assistance is a special fund in
 the state treasury outside the general revenue fund.  The fund is
 composed of:
 (1)  money transferred to the fund at the direction of
 the legislature;
 (2)  gifts and grants contributed to the fund;
 (3)  the earnings of the fund;
 (4)  money transferred to the fund from proceeds of the
 lottery game operated under Section 466.027 or transferred to the
 fund under Section 466.408(b); [and]
 (5)  money deposited to the credit of the fund under
 Section 502.1746, Transportation Code; and
 (6)  money deposited to the credit of the fund under
 Section 521.008, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.008.  VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION TO FUND FOR VETERANS'
 ASSISTANCE. (a) When a person applies for an original or renewal
 driver's license or personal identification certificate under this
 chapter, the person may make a voluntary contribution in any amount
 to the fund for veterans' assistance established by Section
 434.017, Government Code.
 (b)  The department shall:
 (1)  include space on the first page of each
 application for an original or renewal driver's license or personal
 identification certificate that allows a person applying for an
 original or renewal driver's license or personal identification
 certificate to indicate the amount that the person is voluntarily
 contributing to the fund; and
 (2)  provide an opportunity for the person to
 contribute to the fund during the application process for an
 original or renewal driver's license or personal identification
 certificate on the department's Internet website.
 (c)  The department shall send any contribution made under
 this section to the comptroller for deposit in the state treasury to
 the credit of the fund for veterans' assistance not later than the
 14th day of each month. Before sending the money to the fund, the
 department may deduct money equal to the amount of reasonable
 expenses for administering this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *