Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB646 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Patrick, Cortez, King of Taylor H.B. No. 646
 (Senate Sponsor - Uresti)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for members appointed to the Texas
 State Board of Examiners of Psychologists.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 501.051, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  One of the members appointed under Subsection (a)(1)
 or (a)(2) must practice as a licensed specialist in school
 psychology under Section 501.260.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act in the
 qualifications of members of the Texas State Board of Examiners of
 Psychologists do not affect the entitlement of a member serving on
 the board immediately before the effective date of this Act to
 continue to serve for the remainder of the member's term.  As the
 terms of board members expire, the governor shall appoint or
 reappoint a member who has the qualifications required for a member
 under Section 501.051(a-1), Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *