E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4259
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1115
|
Journal Page: 4260
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4259
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3902
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1084
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#239
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1618
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 392
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 392
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|