House
|
04/25/2013
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 332
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 393
|
House
|
01/24/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|