Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB696 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kleinschmidt (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 696
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duties of and the application of the professional
 prosecutors law to the county attorney in Gonzales County and to the
 duties of the district attorney for the 25th Judicial District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.112, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 43.112.  25TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT. The voters of
 [Gonzales,] Guadalupe[,] and Lavaca counties elect a district
 attorney for the 25th Judicial District who represents the state in
 the [that] district courts [court only] in those counties. In
 addition to exercising the duties and authority conferred on
 district attorneys by general law, the district attorney represents
 the state in all criminal cases in the district courts in those
 counties.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 45, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 45.189 to read as follows:
 Sec. 45.189.  GONZALES COUNTY. (a)  In Gonzales County, the
 county attorney of Gonzales County shall perform the duties imposed
 on and have the powers conferred on district attorneys by general
 law.
 (b)  The county attorney of Gonzales County or the
 Commissioners Court of Gonzales County may accept gifts or grants
 from any individual, partnership, corporation, trust, foundation,
 association, or governmental entity for the purpose of financing or
 assisting the operation of the office of county attorney in
 Gonzales County. The county attorney shall account for and report
 to the commissioners court all gifts or grants accepted under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Section 46.002, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 46.002.  PROSECUTORS SUBJECT TO CHAPTER.  This chapter
 applies to the state prosecuting attorney, all county prosecutors,
 and the following state prosecutors:
 (1)  the district attorneys for Kenedy and Kleberg
 Counties and for the 1st, 2nd, 8th, 9th, 12th, 18th, 21st, 23rd,
 25th, 26th, 27th, 29th, 31st, 32nd, 33rd, 34th, 35th, 36th, 38th,
 39th, 42nd, 43rd, 46th, 47th, 49th, 50th, 51st, 52nd, 53rd, 63rd,
 64th, 66th, 69th, 70th, 76th, 81st, 83rd, 84th, 85th, 88th, 90th,
 97th, 100th, 105th, 106th, 109th, 110th, 112th, 118th, 119th,
 123rd, 142nd, 143rd, 145th, 156th, 159th, 173rd, 196th, 198th,
 216th, 220th, 229th, 235th, 253rd, 258th, 259th, 266th, 268th,
 271st, 286th, 329th, 344th, 349th, 355th, and 506th judicial
 districts;
 (2)  the criminal district attorneys for the counties
 of Anderson, Austin, Bastrop, Bexar, Bowie, Brazoria, Caldwell,
 Calhoun, Cass, Collin, Comal, Dallas, Deaf Smith, Denton, Eastland,
 Fannin, Galveston, Grayson, Gregg, Harrison, Hays, Hidalgo,
 Jasper, Jefferson, Kaufman, Lubbock, McLennan, Madison, Navarro,
 Newton, Panola, Polk, Randall, Rockwall, San Jacinto, Smith,
 Tarrant, Taylor, Tyler, Upshur, Van Zandt, Victoria, Walker,
 Waller, Wichita, Wood, and Yoakum; and
 (3)  the county attorneys performing the duties of
 district attorneys in the counties of Andrews, Callahan, Cameron,
 Castro, Colorado, Crosby, Ellis, Falls, Freestone, Gonzales,
 Lamar, Lamb, Lampasas, Lee, Limestone, Marion, Milam, Morris,
 Ochiltree, Orange, Rains, Red River, Robertson, Rusk, Swisher,
 Terry, Webb, and Willacy.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *