Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#704 | Journal Page: 2866 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2866 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2866 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2790 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2790 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1225 | |
House | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 395 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 395 | |
House | 01/25/2013 | Filed |