Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB714 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 714
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an agreement between a county and the Department of
 Public Safety for the joint operation of certain fixed-site
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 621, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 621.411 to read as follows:
 Sec. 621.411.  JOINT OPERATION OF CERTAIN FIXED-SITE
 FACILITIES. A county and the Department of Public Safety may enter
 into an agreement for the joint operation of a fixed-site facility
 located within the boundaries of the county.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *