House | 05/03/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2310 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 275 | Journal Page: 2309 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 241 | |
House | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 241 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |