Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB722 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 722
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; May 13, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to impose a county
 hotel occupancy tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (s) to read as follows:
 (s)  The commissioners court of a county through which the
 Nueces River flows, that has a population of more than 11,500 and
 less than 25,000, and that shares a border with a county that
 borders the United Mexican States may impose a tax as provided by
 Subsection (a). The tax imposed under this subsection does not
 apply to a hotel located in a municipality that imposes a tax under
 Chapter 351 applicable to the hotel.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *