Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB738 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Crownover (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 738
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the review of the creation of certain proposed
 municipal utility districts by county commissioners courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.0161, Water Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 54.0161.  REVIEW OF CREATION BY COUNTY. (a) This
 section applies only to a proposed district all of which is to be
 located outside the corporate limits of a municipality.
 (a-1)  Promptly after a petition is filed with the commission
 to create a district to which this section applies, the commission
 shall notify the commissioners court of any county in which the
 proposed district is to be located.
 (a-2)  The [If all or part of a proposed district is to be
 located outside the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a city, the]
 commissioners court of a [the] county in which the district is to be
 located may review the petition for creation and other evidence and
 information relating to the proposed district that the
 commissioners consider necessary. Petitioners for the creation of a
 district shall submit to the county commissioners court any
 relevant information requested by the commissioners court [in the
 event a review is done].
 (b)  In the event the county commissioners court votes to
 submit information to the commission or to make a recommendation
 regarding the creation of the proposed district [of a review], the
 commissioners court shall submit to the commission, at least 10
 days before the date set for action [the hearing] on the petition, a
 written opinion stating:
 (1)  whether [or not] the commissioners court
 recommends [county would recommend] the creation of the proposed
 district; and
 (2)  [stating] any findings, conclusions, and other
 information that the commissioners court thinks [think] would
 assist the commission in making a final determination on the
 petition.
 (c)  In passing on a petition subject to [under] this section
 [subchapter], the commission shall consider the written opinion
 submitted by the county commissioners court.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a petition for the creation of a municipal utility district that is
 filed with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A petition pending before the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect at the time the petition
 was filed, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *