Senate | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3078 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#795 | Journal Page: 3077 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3077 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3077 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3077 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3009 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3009 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3008 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 397 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 397 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |