Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB749 Engrossed / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   H.B. 749     83R14980 MEW-F   By: Raymond; Alvarado (Lucio)         Government Organization         5/10/2013         Engrossed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center H.B. 749
83R14980 MEW-F By: Raymond; Alvarado (Lucio)
 Government Organization
 5/10/2013
 Engrossed

Senate Research Center

H.B. 749

83R14980 MEW-F

By: Raymond; Alvarado (Lucio)

 

Government Organization

 

5/10/2013

 

Engrossed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, under the summer food service program (SFSP), schools may partner or collaborate with another organization to carry out the program. It is often through these public-private partnerships that the SFSP is able to make the program work best. Many of these private entities work very closely with schools and the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA) to maximize participation and funding.    As a result of these successful partnerships, the Texas Hunger Initiative at Baylor University has been identified as resource for TDA to help increase participation of eligible students in the SFSP.   H.B. 749 seeks to build on these public-private partnerships by requiring TDA to partner with Baylor University's Texas Hunger Initiative to develop a five-year plan to increase outcomes in the summer food service program.    H.B. 749 amends current law relating to a plan to increase outcomes in the summer food service program.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, by adding Section 12.00291, as follows:   Sec. 12.00291. PLAN TO INCREASE OUTCOMES IN SUMMER FOOD SERVICE PROGRAM. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA) to develop a five-year plan in collaboration with Baylor University's Texas Hunger Initiative and implement no-cost provisions to increase outcomes in the summer food service program under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761. Requires that the plan include methods to increase participation by children eligible to receive free or reduced-price school lunches and strategies to increase access to summer meals in rural areas for children eligible to receive free or reduced-price school lunches.   (b) Requires TDA, in developing the plan, to involve any appropriate TDA advisory committee that already exists and to seek the participation of relevant stakeholders.   (c) Requires TDA, not later than November 1, 2014, to submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate standing committees of the legislature the plan to be implemented over the next four years.   (d) Authorizes TDA to solicit and accept a gift, grant, or donation from any source, including a foundation or private entity, for the development of the plan. Authorizes the plan to be developed and implemented only if sufficient funds are available under this subsection for that purpose.   (e) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2018.   SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2013.     

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, under the summer food service program (SFSP), schools may partner or collaborate with another organization to carry out the program. It is often through these public-private partnerships that the SFSP is able to make the program work best. Many of these private entities work very closely with schools and the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA) to maximize participation and funding. 

 

As a result of these successful partnerships, the Texas Hunger Initiative at Baylor University has been identified as resource for TDA to help increase participation of eligible students in the SFSP.

 

H.B. 749 seeks to build on these public-private partnerships by requiring TDA to partner with Baylor University's Texas Hunger Initiative to develop a five-year plan to increase outcomes in the summer food service program. 

 

H.B. 749 amends current law relating to a plan to increase outcomes in the summer food service program.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, by adding Section 12.00291, as follows:

 

Sec. 12.00291. PLAN TO INCREASE OUTCOMES IN SUMMER FOOD SERVICE PROGRAM. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Agriculture (TDA) to develop a five-year plan in collaboration with Baylor University's Texas Hunger Initiative and implement no-cost provisions to increase outcomes in the summer food service program under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761. Requires that the plan include methods to increase participation by children eligible to receive free or reduced-price school lunches and strategies to increase access to summer meals in rural areas for children eligible to receive free or reduced-price school lunches.

 

(b) Requires TDA, in developing the plan, to involve any appropriate TDA advisory committee that already exists and to seek the participation of relevant stakeholders.

 

(c) Requires TDA, not later than November 1, 2014, to submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate standing committees of the legislature the plan to be implemented over the next four years.

 

(d) Authorizes TDA to solicit and accept a gift, grant, or donation from any source, including a foundation or private entity, for the development of the plan. Authorizes the plan to be developed and implemented only if sufficient funds are available under this subsection for that purpose.

 

(e) Provides that this section expires September 1, 2018.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: September 1, 2013.