House | 04/15/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |