House | 03/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |