Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1438 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2226 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#452 | Journal Page: 2226 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2226 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Amended | 1-Kolkhorst, G. Bonnen, and J. Sheffield | Journal Page: 2224 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2224 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#431 | Journal Page: 2135 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Amendment tabled | 1-Laubenberg | Journal Page: 2134 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2134 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |