Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2488 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#564 | Journal Page: 2487 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2487 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2487 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2452 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Amended | 2-White | Journal Page: 2451 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |