Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB780 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R2930 CJC-D
 By: Farias H.B. No. 780


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Legislative Budget Board of the effect of
 ad valorem tax exemptions for certain veterans and their surviving
 spouses and children on local and state revenue and the state's
 economy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "board" means the
 Legislative Budget Board.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY OF EFFECT OF EXEMPTIONS. (a) The board
 shall conduct a comprehensive study to determine the effect of the
 exemption described by Subsection (b) of this section on local and
 state revenue and the state's economy.
 (b)  The exemption would exempt from ad valorem taxation
 $5,000 of the assessed value of a property owned by a veteran of the
 armed services of the United States if the veteran is a resident of
 this state and:
 (1)  served on active duty during:
 (A)  World War II;
 (B)  the national emergency that began on June 27,
 1950, and that is referred to as the Korean War;
 (C)  the conflict in Vietnam, which began on
 December 21, 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
 (D)  the Persian Gulf War, which began on August
 2, 1990, and ended on April 6, 1991; or
 (E)  the military operations against Afghanistan
 or Iraq that began after September 11, 2001; or
 (2)  was awarded, as a result of the veteran's service
 in the armed services, any of the following medals:
 (A)  the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal;
 (B)  the Navy Expeditionary Medal;
 (C)  the Marine Corps Expeditionary Medal; or
 (D)  the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary
 Medal.
 (c)  In conducting the study, the board shall consider the
 additional effect on local and state revenue and the state's
 economy if on the death of the veteran receiving the exemption:
 (1)  the veteran's surviving spouse is entitled to
 receive an exemption from taxation of a portion of the assessed
 value of property the surviving spouse owns in the amount of the
 veteran's exemption at the time of the veteran's death for as long
 as the surviving spouse remains unmarried; or
 (2)  each of the veteran's surviving children who are
 under 18 years of age and unmarried are entitled to receive an
 exemption from taxation of a portion of the assessed value of
 property the child owns in the amount of the veteran's exemption at
 the time of the veteran's death, if the veteran does not leave a
 surviving spouse.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2014, the
 board shall submit a report of the results of the study to the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the senate
 and house of representatives having primary jurisdiction over
 matters affecting tax revenue. The report must:
 (1)  describe the methods used by the board to
 determine the effect of the exemptions described by Section 2 of
 this Act on local and state revenue and the state's economy;
 (2)  state in a dollar amount the estimated effect on
 local and state revenue of:
 (A)  the exemption described by Section 2(b) of
 this Act; and
 (B)  the exemption described by Section 2(c) of
 this Act; and
 (3)  include a complete discussion of:
 (A)  the effect of any reduction in the amount of
 available local revenue attributable to the exemptions described by
 Section 2 of this Act on:
 (i)  school district staffing levels and the
 diversity of educational and extracurricular programs offered by
 school districts; and
 (ii)  social services programs offered to
 the public by counties, municipalities, and other local taxing
 units; and
 (B)  the effect of any aid that school districts
 may be entitled to receive under state law as a result of the
 exemptions described by Section 2 of this Act on:
 (i)  the state's current and long-term
 economic health; and
 (ii)  the continued operation of social
 services programs currently offered by the state to the public.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION DATE.  This Act expires January 1,
 2015.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.