Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB789 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Parker (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 789
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 18, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allowance in lieu of exempt property in the
 administration of a decedent's estate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 ARTICLE 1. CHANGES TO TEXAS PROBATE CODE
 SECTION 1.01.  Section 273, Texas Probate Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 273.  ALLOWANCE IN LIEU OF EXEMPT PROPERTY.  In case
 there should not be among the effects of the deceased all or any of
 the specific articles exempted from execution or forced sale by the
 Constitution and laws of this state, the court shall make a
 reasonable allowance in lieu thereof, to be paid to such surviving
 spouse and children, or such of them as there are, as hereinafter
 provided.  The allowance in lieu of a homestead shall in no case
 exceed $45,000 [$15,000] and the allowance for other exempted
 property shall in no case exceed $30,000 [$5,000], exclusive of the
 allowance for the support of the surviving spouse, minor children,
 and adult incapacitated children which is hereinafter provided for.
 SECTION 1.02.  The changes in law made by this article to
 Section 273, Texas Probate Code, apply only to the estate of a
 decedent who dies on or after the effective date of this Act. The
 estate of a decedent who dies before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date of the decedent's
 death, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 ARTICLE 2. CHANGES TO ESTATES CODE
 SECTION 2.01.  Section 353.053(b), Estates Code, as
 effective January 1, 2014, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The allowance in lieu of a homestead may not exceed
 $45,000 [$15,000], and the allowance in lieu of other exempt
 property may not exceed $30,000 [$5,000], excluding the family
 allowance for the support of the surviving spouse, minor children,
 and adult incapacitated children provided by Subchapter C.
 SECTION 2.02.  Section 273, Texas Probate Code, as amended
 by Article 1 of this Act, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.03.  This article takes effect January 1, 2014.
 ARTICLE 3. EFFECTIVE DATE
 SECTION 3.01.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act,
 this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *