Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB797 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris, Miles H.B. No. 797
 (Senate Sponsor - Garcia)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain written information the Windham School District
 must provide to a person before the person enrolls in a district
 vocational training program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 19, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Section 19.0042 to read as follows:
 Sec. 19.0042.  INFORMATION TO BE PROVIDED BY DISTRICT BEFORE
 VOCATIONAL TRAINING PROGRAM ENROLLMENT. Before a person described
 by Section 19.005 enrolls in a district vocational training
 program, the district must inform the person in writing of:
 (1)  any rule or policy of a state agency that would
 impose a restriction or prohibition on the person in obtaining a
 certificate or license in connection with the vocational training
 program;
 (2)  the total number of district students released
 during the preceding 10 years who have completed a district
 vocational training program that allows for an opportunity to apply
 for a certificate or license from a state agency and, of those
 students:
 (A)  the number who have applied for a certificate
 or license from a state agency;
 (B)  the number who have been issued a certificate
 or license by a state agency; and
 (C)  the number who have been denied a certificate
 or license by a state agency; and
 (3)  the procedures for:
 (A)  requesting a criminal history evaluation
 letter under Section 53.102, Occupations Code;
 (B)  providing evidence of fitness to perform the
 duties and discharge the responsibilities of a licensed occupation
 for purposes of Section 53.023, Occupations Code; and
 (C)  appealing a state agency's denial of a
 certificate or license, including deadlines and due process
 requirements:
 (i)  to the State Office of Administrative
 Hearings under Subchapter C, Chapter 2001, Government Code; and
 (ii)  through any other available avenue.
 SECTION 2.  Section 19.0042, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only regarding enrollment of a person in a Windham
 School District vocational training program on or after September
 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *