1 | 1 | | By: Rose (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 802 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 3, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Intergovernmental Relations; May 10, 2013, reported favorably by |
---|
5 | 5 | | the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to |
---|
6 | 6 | | printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the definition of an authorized emergency vehicle. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 541.201(1), Transportation Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) "Authorized emergency vehicle" means: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (A) a fire department or police vehicle; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (B) a public or private ambulance operated by a |
---|
18 | 18 | | person who has been issued a license by the [Texas] Department of |
---|
19 | 19 | | State Health Services; |
---|
20 | 20 | | (C) a municipal department or public service |
---|
21 | 21 | | corporation emergency vehicle that has been designated or |
---|
22 | 22 | | authorized by the governing body of a municipality; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (D) a county-owned or county-leased emergency |
---|
24 | 24 | | management vehicle that has been designated or authorized by the |
---|
25 | 25 | | commissioners court; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (E) [(D)] a private vehicle of a volunteer |
---|
27 | 27 | | firefighter or a certified emergency medical services employee or |
---|
28 | 28 | | volunteer when responding to a fire alarm or medical emergency; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (F) [(E)] an industrial emergency response |
---|
30 | 30 | | vehicle, including an industrial ambulance, when responding to an |
---|
31 | 31 | | emergency, but only if the vehicle is operated in compliance with |
---|
32 | 32 | | criteria in effect September 1, 1989, and established by the |
---|
33 | 33 | | predecessor of the Texas Industrial Emergency Services Board of the |
---|
34 | 34 | | State Firemen's and Fire Marshals' Association of Texas; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (G) [(F)] a vehicle of a blood bank or tissue |
---|
36 | 36 | | bank, accredited or approved under the laws of this state or the |
---|
37 | 37 | | United States, when making emergency deliveries of blood, drugs, |
---|
38 | 38 | | medicines, or organs; or |
---|
39 | 39 | | (H) [(G)] a vehicle used for law enforcement |
---|
40 | 40 | | purposes that is owned or leased by a federal governmental entity. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
42 | 42 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
43 | 43 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
44 | 44 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
45 | 45 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
46 | 46 | | * * * * * |
---|