Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB809 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: J. Davis of Harris, Alvarado, Guillen H.B. No. 809
 (Senate Sponsor - Deuell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dissemination of information regarding employment
 opportunities in this state to secondary school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 302.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 302.014.  EMPLOYMENT INFORMATION FOR SECONDARY SCHOOL
 STUDENTS. (a) The commission shall provide the Texas Education
 Agency with information at least each quarter regarding current and
 projected employment opportunities in this state, disaggregated by
 county or other appropriate region.
 (b)  The Texas Education Agency shall provide the
 information obtained under Subsection (a) to school districts for
 use in local planning and implementation of career and technical
 education and training programs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *