Senate | 05/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 664 | |
House | 03/28/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | RV#130 | Journal Page: 1170 |
House | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1170 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1170 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1167 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1167 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 733 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |