Senate | 05/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1860 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1383 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2109 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#423 | Journal Page: 2108 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2068 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2067 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Amended | 1-Burnam | Journal Page: 2067 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2067 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |