House | 05/03/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2357 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 186 | Journal Page: 2357 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Postponed | 5/3/13 4:30 PM | Journal Page: 2307 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2307 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Postponed | 5/3/13 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 1989 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Postponed | 4/29/13 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 1752 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1752 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |