E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4540
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2890
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#295
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1456
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
House
|
01/30/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|