Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 890 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1544 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#204 | Journal Page: 1523 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1523 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1523 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1489 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |