By: Lucio III, N. Gonzalez of El Paso, Fallon H.B. No. 843 (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013; May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to persons entitled to notice of and to participation in certain hearings regarding a child in the conservatorship of the state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 263.301(b), Family Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The following persons are entitled to at least 10 days' notice of a permanency hearing and are entitled to present evidence and be heard at the hearing: (1) the department; (2) the foster parent, preadoptive parent, relative of the child providing care, or director of the group home or institution where the child is residing; (3) each parent of the child; (4) the managing conservator or guardian of the child; (5) an attorney ad litem appointed for the child under Chapter 107; (6) a volunteer advocate appointed for the child under Chapter 107; [and] (7) the child if: (A) the child is 10 years of age or older; or (B) the court determines it is appropriate for the child to receive notice; and (8) any other person or agency named by the court to have an interest in the child's welfare. SECTION 2. Section 263.501(d), Family Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) The following are entitled to not less than 10 days' notice of a placement review hearing and are entitled to present evidence and be heard at the hearing: (1) the department; (2) the foster parent, preadoptive parent, relative of the child providing care, or director of the group home or institution in which the child is residing; (3) each parent of the child; (4) each possessory conservator or guardian of the child; (5) the child's attorney ad litem and volunteer advocate, if the appointments were not dismissed in the final order; [and] (6) the child if: (A) the child is 10 years of age or older; or (B) the court determines it is appropriate for the child to receive notice; and (7) any other person or agency named by the court as having an interest in the child's welfare. SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only to a hearing held on or after September 10, 2013. A hearing held before that date is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *