Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#508
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1202
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
House
|
01/30/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|