E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4942
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1296
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4941
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4855
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4855
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4855
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4071
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1293
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1293
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#318
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1876
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1225
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
House
|
01/31/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|