1 | 1 | | By: Crownover, Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 878 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Natural Resources; May 8, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 8, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the filing with the state of electric logs by operators |
---|
11 | 11 | | of oil-related or gas-related wells; providing a penalty. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 91.552, Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 91.552. ELECTRIC LOGS REQUIRED TO BE FILED; CRITERIA. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) Except as otherwise provided by this subchapter, not later than |
---|
17 | 17 | | the 90th day after the date a drilling operation is completed, the |
---|
18 | 18 | | operator shall file with the commission a copy of each electric log, |
---|
19 | 19 | | including each borehole section of the log at all depths, [a basic |
---|
20 | 20 | | electric log] run after September 1, 2013 [September 1, 1985], in |
---|
21 | 21 | | conjunction with the drilling or deepening of the well that meets |
---|
22 | 22 | | basic criteria established by the commission. Each electric log |
---|
23 | 23 | | must be filed with the commission electronically in a manner |
---|
24 | 24 | | acceptable to the commission if the commission has the |
---|
25 | 25 | | technological capability to receive the electronic filing. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (b) The commission by rule shall establish criteria for |
---|
27 | 27 | | [basic] electric logs to be filed with the commission. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c) Not later than the deadline prescribed by Subsection (a) |
---|
29 | 29 | | for the filing of each electric log, an operator shall file with the |
---|
30 | 30 | | commission a copy of a cased hole log run after September 1, 2013, |
---|
31 | 31 | | in conjunction with the drilling or deepening of a well in lieu of |
---|
32 | 32 | | an electric log run after that date if: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) a cased hole log was run; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) an electric log was not run. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (d) Nothing in this subchapter requires an operator to run |
---|
36 | 36 | | an electric log in conjunction with the drilling or deepening of a |
---|
37 | 37 | | well. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 2. Sections 91.553(b), (e), and (f), Natural |
---|
39 | 39 | | Resources Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) Not later than the date by which an electric log is |
---|
41 | 41 | | required to be filed with the commission under Section 91.552, the |
---|
42 | 42 | | operator may file a written request with the commission asking that |
---|
43 | 43 | | the electric log remain confidential and not be made available as |
---|
44 | 44 | | public information. On filing this request, the electric log or |
---|
45 | 45 | | copy of the electric log required to be filed with the commission |
---|
46 | 46 | | may be retained by the operator, and the electric log may remain in |
---|
47 | 47 | | the possession of the operator for the period of confidentiality |
---|
48 | 48 | | [and any extensions of that period]. On filing of the request for |
---|
49 | 49 | | confidentiality, the electric log becomes confidential and remains |
---|
50 | 50 | | confidential for a period of: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) three years [one year] after the date that the |
---|
52 | 52 | | drilling operation was completed, if the well is an onshore well; or |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) five years after the date that the drilling |
---|
54 | 54 | | operation was completed, if the well is a bay or offshore well. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (e) An operator required to file an electric log under this |
---|
56 | 56 | | section who has held the log during a period of confidentiality [or |
---|
57 | 57 | | any extensions of that period] shall file the log with the |
---|
58 | 58 | | commission within 30 days after the conclusion of the period of |
---|
59 | 59 | | confidentiality [or the period of the last extension]. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (f) An operator who fails to timely file with the commission |
---|
61 | 61 | | a written request under Subsection (b) that an electric log remain |
---|
62 | 62 | | confidential and not be made available as public information [or a |
---|
63 | 63 | | written request under Subsection (c) or (d) for an extension of the |
---|
64 | 64 | | period of confidentiality] shall file the log with the commission |
---|
65 | 65 | | immediately after the conclusion of the period for filing the |
---|
66 | 66 | | request. |
---|
67 | 67 | | SECTION 3. Section 91.556, Natural Resources Code, is |
---|
68 | 68 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
69 | 69 | | Sec. 91.556. ENFORCEMENT [DENIAL OF ALLOWABLE]. If an |
---|
70 | 70 | | operator fails to file an electric log as required by this |
---|
71 | 71 | | subchapter, the commission may: |
---|
72 | 72 | | (1) if the well is completed as a producing well, |
---|
73 | 73 | | refuse to assign an allowable or a change in allowable for |
---|
74 | 74 | | production from the well for which the electric log is required |
---|
75 | 75 | | until the operator files the electric log with the commission; or |
---|
76 | 76 | | (2) impose an administrative penalty on the operator |
---|
77 | 77 | | in the manner provided by Sections 81.0531-81.0534 for each well |
---|
78 | 78 | | for which the operator failed to file an electric log. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 4. Section 552.113(c)(2), Government Code, is |
---|
80 | 80 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
81 | 81 | | (2) "Electric [Basic electric] logs" has the same |
---|
82 | 82 | | meaning as it has in Chapter 91, Natural Resources Code. |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 5. Sections 552.113(d), (e), and (f), Government |
---|
84 | 84 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
85 | 85 | | (d) Confidential material, except [basic] electric logs, |
---|
86 | 86 | | filed in the General Land Office on or after September 1, 1985, is |
---|
87 | 87 | | public information and is available to the public under Section |
---|
88 | 88 | | 552.021 on and after the later of: |
---|
89 | 89 | | (1) five years from the filing date of the |
---|
90 | 90 | | confidential material; or |
---|
91 | 91 | | (2) one year from the expiration, termination, or |
---|
92 | 92 | | forfeiture of the lease in connection with which the confidential |
---|
93 | 93 | | material was filed. |
---|
94 | 94 | | (e) Electric [Basic electric] logs filed in the General Land |
---|
95 | 95 | | Office on or after September 1, 1985, are either public information |
---|
96 | 96 | | or confidential material to the same extent and for the same periods |
---|
97 | 97 | | provided for the same logs by Chapter 91, Natural Resources Code. A |
---|
98 | 98 | | person may request that an [a basic] electric log that has been |
---|
99 | 99 | | filed in the General Land Office be made confidential by filing with |
---|
100 | 100 | | the land office a copy of the written request for confidentiality |
---|
101 | 101 | | made to the Railroad Commission of Texas for the same log. |
---|
102 | 102 | | (f) The following are public information: |
---|
103 | 103 | | (1) [basic] electric logs filed in the General Land |
---|
104 | 104 | | Office before September 1, 1985; and |
---|
105 | 105 | | (2) confidential material, except [basic] electric |
---|
106 | 106 | | logs, filed in the General Land Office before September 1, 1985, |
---|
107 | 107 | | provided, that Subsection (d) governs the disclosure of that |
---|
108 | 108 | | confidential material filed in connection with a lease that is a |
---|
109 | 109 | | valid and subsisting lease on September 1, 1995. |
---|
110 | 110 | | SECTION 6. Sections 91.553(c) and (d), Natural Resources |
---|
111 | 111 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
112 | 112 | | SECTION 7. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
113 | 113 | | a drilling operation that is completed on or after the effective |
---|
114 | 114 | | date of this Act. A drilling operation that is completed before the |
---|
115 | 115 | | effective date of this Act is subject to the law in effect on the |
---|
116 | 116 | | date of completion, and that law is continued in effect for that |
---|
117 | 117 | | purpose. |
---|
118 | 118 | | SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
119 | 119 | | * * * * * |
---|