E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3691 | |
House | 05/18/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3911 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3670 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1961 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1960 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1338 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2045 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#387 | Journal Page: 2045 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2045 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2045 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2001 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 424 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 424 | |
House | 01/31/2013 | Filed |