House | 03/26/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1173 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 02/12/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/01/2013 | Filed |