Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB908 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nevarez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 908
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the assessment of an elderly or disabled person's
 psychological status for purposes of an emergency order authorizing
 protective services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 48.208(c-3), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c-3)  An assessment of the elderly or disabled person's
 psychological status must be performed by a licensed professional
 counselor, licensed psychologist, or master social worker who has
 training and expertise in issues related to abuse, neglect, and
 exploitation.  The person performing the assessment shall sign a
 report stating:
 (1)  that the elderly or disabled person is reported to
 be suffering from abuse, neglect, or exploitation, which may
 present a threat to the person's life or physical safety; and
 (2)  that in the professional opinion of the licensed
 professional counselor, licensed psychologist, or master social
 worker, as applicable, the issuance of an emergency order
 authorizing protective services without the elderly or disabled
 person's consent is necessary under the circumstances.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *