House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 02/04/2013 | Filed |