E
|
05/27/2013
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3849
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3195
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4586
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1193
|
Journal Page: 4586
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4586
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#764
|
Journal Page: 3046
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3046
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3046
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2937
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2936
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2936
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 242
|
House
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 242
|
House
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|