Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB970 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez of Travis, et al. H.B. No. 970
 (Senate Sponsor - Deuell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of cottage food products and cottage food
 production operations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subdivisions (2-a) and (2-b) and adding
 Subdivision (3-b) to read as follows:
 (2-a)  "Baked good" includes cookies, cakes, breads,
 Danish, donuts, pastries, pies, and other items that are prepared
 by baking the item in an oven.  [A baked good does not include a
 potentially hazardous food item as defined by department rule.]
 (2-b)  "Cottage food production operation" means an
 individual, operating out of the individual's home, who:
 (A)  produces at the individual's home, subject to
 Section 437.0196:
 (i)  a baked good that is not a potentially
 hazardous food, as defined by Section 437.0196;
 (ii)  candy;
 (iii)  coated and uncoated nuts;
 (iv)  unroasted nut butters;
 (v)  fruit butters;
 (vi)  [,] a canned jam or jelly;
 (vii)  a fruit pie;
 (viii)  dehydrated fruit or vegetables,
 including dried beans;
 (ix)  popcorn and popcorn snacks;
 (x)  cereal, including granola;
 (xi)  dry mix;
 (xii)  vinegar;
 (xiii)  pickles;
 (xiv)  mustard;
 (xv)  roasted coffee or dry tea;[,] or
 (xvi)  a dried herb or dried herb mix [for
 sale at the person's home];
 (B)  has an annual gross income of $50,000 or less
 from the sale of food described by Paragraph (A); [and]
 (C)  sells the foods produced under Paragraph (A)
 only directly to consumers at the individual's home, a farmers'
 market, a farm stand, or a municipal, county, or nonprofit fair,
 festival, or event; and
 (D)  delivers products to the consumer at the
 point of sale or another location designated by the consumer.
 (3-b)  "Farm stand" means a premises owned and operated
 by a producer of agricultural food products at which the producer or
 other persons may offer for sale produce or foods described by
 Subdivision (2-b)(A).
 SECTION 2.  Section 437.0191, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.0191.  EXEMPTION FOR COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION
 OPERATIONS. (a)  A cottage food production operation is not a food
 service establishment for purposes of this chapter.
 (b)  The exemption provided by Subsection (a) does not affect
 the application of Sections 431.045, 431.0495, and 431.247
 authorizing the department or other local health authority to act
 to prevent an immediate and serious threat to human life or health.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 437.0192, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.0192.  REGULATION OF COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION
 OPERATIONS BY LOCAL GOVERNMENT AUTHORITIES [HEALTH DEPARTMENT]
 PROHIBITED; COMPLAINTS.
 SECTION 4.  Section 437.0192(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A local government authority, including a local health
 department, may not regulate the production of food at a cottage
 food production operation.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 437.0193 and 437.0194, Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.0193.  PACKAGING AND LABELING REQUIREMENTS FOR
 COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION OPERATIONS.  (a)  Food described by
 Section 437.001(2-b)(A) sold by a cottage food production operation
 must be packaged in a manner that prevents product contamination,
 except that a food item is not required to be packaged if it is too
 large or bulky for conventional packaging.
 (b) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules requiring a
 cottage food production operation to label all of the foods
 described in Section 437.001(2-b)(A) that the operation sells to
 consumers.  The label must include:
 (1)  the name and address of the cottage food
 production operation; and
 (2)  a statement that the food is not inspected by the
 department or a local health department.
 (c)  For foods not required to be packaged under Subsection
 (a), the information required to be included on the label under
 Subsection (b) must be provided to the consumer on an invoice or
 receipt.
 Sec. 437.0194.  CERTAIN SALES BY COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION
 OPERATIONS [THROUGH THE INTERNET] PROHIBITED.  A cottage food
 production operation may not sell any of the foods described in
 Section 437.001(2-b)(A):
 (1)  through the Internet;
 (2)  by mail order; or
 (3)  at wholesale.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Sections 437.0195 and 437.0196 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.0195.  PRODUCTION OF COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTS. (a) An
 individual who operates a cottage food production operation must
 have successfully completed a basic food safety education or
 training program for food handlers accredited under Subchapter D,
 Chapter 438.
 (b)  An individual may not process, prepare, package, or
 handle cottage food products unless the individual:
 (1)  meets the requirements of Subsection (a);
 (2)  is directly supervised by an individual described
 by Subsection (a); or
 (3)  is a member of the household in which the cottage
 food products are produced.
 Sec. 437.0196.  POTENTIALLY HAZARDOUS FOOD; PROHIBITION FOR
 COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION OPERATIONS. (a) In this section,
 "potentially hazardous food" means a food that requires time and
 temperature control for safety to limit pathogen growth or toxin
 production. The term includes a food that must be held under proper
 temperature controls, such as refrigeration, to prevent the growth
 of bacteria that may cause human illness. A potentially hazardous
 food may include a food that contains protein and moisture and is
 neutral or slightly acidic, such as meat, poultry, fish, and
 shellfish products, pasteurized and unpasteurized milk and dairy
 products, raw seed sprouts, baked goods that require refrigeration,
 including cream or custard pies or cakes, and ice products. The
 term does not include a food that uses potentially hazardous food as
 ingredients if the final food product does not require time or
 temperature control for safety to limit pathogen growth or toxin
 production.
 (b)  A cottage food production operation may not sell to
 customers potentially hazardous foods.
 SECTION 7.  Chapter 211, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. REGULATION OF COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION OPERATIONS
 Sec. 211.031.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter, "cottage
 food production operation" and "home" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 437.001, Health and Safety Code.
 Sec. 211.032.  CERTAIN ZONING REGULATIONS PROHIBITED. A
 municipal zoning ordinance may not prohibit the use of a home for
 cottage food production operations.
 Sec. 211.033.  ACTION FOR NUISANCE OR OTHER TORT. This
 subchapter does not affect the right of a person to bring a cause of
 action under other law against an individual for nuisance or
 another tort arising out of the individual's use of the individual's
 home for cottage food production operations.
 SECTION 8.  Chapter 231, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter M to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER M. REGULATION OF COTTAGE FOOD PRODUCTION OPERATIONS
 Sec. 231.281.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter, "cottage
 food production operation" and "home" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 437.001, Health and Safety Code.
 Sec. 231.282.  CERTAIN ZONING REGULATIONS PROHIBITED. A
 county zoning ordinance may not prohibit the use of a home for
 cottage food production operations.
 Sec. 231.283.  ACTION FOR NUISANCE OR OTHER TORT. This
 subchapter does not affect the right of a person to bring a cause of
 action under other law against an individual for nuisance or
 another tort arising out of the individual's use of the individual's
 home for cottage food production operations.
 SECTION 9.  Notwithstanding Section 437.0195, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, an individual operating a cottage
 food production operation is not required to complete a basic food
 safety education or training program for food handlers before
 January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *