E | 05/18/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3911 | |
E | 05/09/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3091 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1581 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 991 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1605 |
House | 04/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1605 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1605 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Record vote | RV#215 | Journal Page: 1571 |
House | 04/16/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1571 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1571 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Amendment fails of adoption | 1-Burnam | Journal Page: 1570 |
House | 04/16/2013 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) | Journal Page: 1570 |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1569 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1104 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 02/05/2013 | Filed |