House | 05/06/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2497 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 354 | Journal Page: 2497 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Postponed | 5/6/13 11:00 AM | Journal Page: 1997 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1997 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 02/05/2013 | Filed |