E | 03/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1191 | |
E | 03/19/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 497 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 799 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 799 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 698 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 698 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 372 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Filed |