E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3194 | |
E | 04/30/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2164 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1329 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1311 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1089 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1647 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Filed |