E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3194 | |
E | 05/06/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2722 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1406 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1331 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1780 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1780 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Filed |