House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1975 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Filed |