E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5443 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3519 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4535 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4555 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4161 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2879 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2878 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1919 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3438 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3438 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3230 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Filed |