E | 05/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
E | 05/23/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4879 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2809 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4070 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2566 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1919 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3230 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Filed |