E | 05/25/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
E | 05/23/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4879 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4066 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2562 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3438 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3438 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Filed |