E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5443 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5440 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3865 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5434 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5439 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5436 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 3866 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3849 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5405 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Record vote | RV#1382 | Journal Page: 5404 |
House | 05/27/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5404 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5404 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4294 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 4062 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Filed |