E | 03/13/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 753 | |
E | 03/12/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 733 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 660 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 238 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 387 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 387 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 231 | |
House | 12/14/2012 | Filed |