E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3194 | |
E | 05/06/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2722 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1460 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2274 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1397 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#200 | Journal Page: 1521 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1104 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 01/23/2013 | Filed |