E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3911 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2844 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2719 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2549 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 326 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 387 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 265 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |